VA HB1395 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0600)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0600)
Summary
Policies for responding to crimes involving sexual assault. Requires that the Department of State Police, local law-enforcement agencies and campus police departments establish written policies and procedures regarding response to incidents involving sexual assault. The Department of Criminal Justice Services is directed to provide law-enforcement agencies with technical support and assistance in developing the policies and procedures and to submit a report on the status of implementing such policies and procedures. A Code section on domestic violence procedures is moved from Title 19.2 to Title 9.1.This bill is identical to
Title
Sexual assault; Dept. of State Police, etc. establish policies for responding to crimes involving.
Sponsors
Del. Clifford Athey [R] | Del. Robert Bell [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Terry Kilgore [R] |
Del. Scott Lingamfelter [R] | Del. James Massie [R] | Del. Donald Merricks [R] | Del. Beverly Sherwood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0600) | |
2008-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 600 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-04 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1395ER) | |
2008-03-04 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-29 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 080901432-S1 (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-28 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1395S1 | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 080901432-S1 | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 080901432-S1 | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1395H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 080530432-H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from Appropriations (24-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-05 | House: Assigned App. sub: Public Safety (Sherwood) | |
2008-02-04 | House: Committee substitute printed 080530432-H1 | |
2008-02-01 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-02-01 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-09 | House: Presented and ordered printed 085969432 |
Same As/Similar To
SB786 (Same As) 2011-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0301)
Subjects
Commissions, Boards and Institutions Generally
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Criminal Procedure
Police, State
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Criminal Procedure
Police, State
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1395 |