VA HB1396 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Certificate of public need; exception. Authorizes the State Health Commissioner to accept, review, and issue a certificate of public need for the establishment of and related equipment for a freestanding diagnostic imaging center located in Planning District 15 that will provide diagnostic imaging services using magnetic resonance imaging (MRI) and computed tomographic (CT) scanning on an outpatient basis.
Title
Certificate of public need; establishes freestanding diagnostic imaging center in Planning Dist.15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18101732D |