VA HB1401 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0334)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0334)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax; sale of sole dwelling for delinquent taxes. Requires that, prior to initiating judicial proceedings to sell real property because of delinquent taxes, the locality must notify the taxpayer that he has the right to request that the treasurer enter into a payment schedule with him to pay the delinquent taxes.
Title
Real property tax; collection of delinquent taxes, notice to taxpayer regarding payment agreement.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 14-N) (Y: 88 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 14-N) (Y: 88 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0334) | |
2013-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 334 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1401ER) |
2013-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 14-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (86-Y 14-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 13104575D-EH1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1401EH1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Amendment by Delegate Cole agreed to |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104575D-H1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104575D-H1 |
2013-01-30 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 5-N) |
2013-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned Finance sub: #2 |
2012-12-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2012-12-17 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101129D |