VA HB1402 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0329)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0329)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; pharmacy benefits managers; reporting requirements; civil penalty. Provides that a person that violates the existing requirement to obtain a license prior to providing pharmacy benefits management services or otherwise acting as a pharmacy benefits manager may be subject to a civil penalty of $5,000 for each day on which such violation occurs. The bill adds additional requirements to existing reporting requirements for insurance carriers relating to pharmacy benefits managers. Such additional requirements include (i) the aggregate amount of a pharmacy benefits manager's retained rebates, as defined in the bill; (ii) a pharmacy benefits manager's aggregate retained rebate percentage, as defined in the bill; and (iii) the aggregate amount of administrative fees received by a pharmacy benefits manager.
Title
Health insurance; pharmacy benefits managers, reporting requirements, civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0329) | |
2024-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 329 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1402ER) |
2024-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 24104835D-E |
2024-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1402E |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2024-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2024-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24104835D |
Same As/Similar To
SB660 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0626)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3465 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3466 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3468 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |