VA HB1421 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - Senate: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: Senate Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - Senate: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: Senate Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Enforcement of federal immigration law by the Commonwealth and its political subdivisions. Provides that no agency of the Commonwealth, political subdivision of the Commonwealth or locality, or an employee of any of them acting in his official capacity, may limit or restrict the enforcement of federal immigration laws to less than the full extent permitted by federal law.
Title
Immigration laws, federal; enforcement by State, political subdivisions, or localities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 26-N) (Y: 75 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | Senate: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Immigration | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 26-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House (73-Y 26-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Printed as engrossed 11100326D-E | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1421E | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-04 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 6-N) | |
2011-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 2-N) | |
2011-01-19 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #3 Immigration | |
2010-10-25 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-10-25 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100326D |