VA HB1421 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Stricken from docket by General Laws (20-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Stricken from docket by General Laws (20-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Housing Trust Fund; eligibility. Expands eligibility for loans from the Virginia Housing Trust Fund to include low, moderate, or middle income persons and families and requires the Department of Housing and Community Development to (i) include definitions for such income levels in program guidelines for administering the Fund and (ii) prioritize funding for low income and middle income housing projects in program guidelines for administering the Fund. Under current law, such loans may be provided only to low or moderate income citizens of Virginia. Virginia Housing Trust Fund; eligibility. Expands eligibility for loans from the Virginia Housing Trust Fund to include low, moderate, or middle income persons and families and requires the Department of Housing and Community Development to (i) include definitions for such income levels in program guidelines for administering the Fund and (ii) prioritize funding for low income and middle income housing projects in program guidelines for administering the Fund. Under current law, such loans may be provided only to low or moderate income citizens of Virginia.
Title
Virginia Housing Trust Fund; expands eligibility for loans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - House - House: Stricken from docket by General Laws (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | Stricken from docket by General Laws (20-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24104430D |
Same As/Similar To
SB681 (Similar To) 2024-01-31 - Passed by indefinitely in General Laws and Technology (9-Y 6-N)