VA HB1430 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - Senate: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: Senate Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - Senate: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: Senate Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Arresting officer to ascertain citizenship of arrestee. Supplements the existing law that requires sheriffs to make a query into legal presence when a person is "taken into custody" at a jail. This bill expands such inquiries by requiring inquiries of everyone arrested, and requires that an arresting officer inquire of every arrestee whether he (i) was born in a country other than the United States and (ii) is a citizen of a country other than the United States.
Title
Citizenship of arrestee; if accused is not committed to jail, arresting officer to ascertain.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 27-N) (Y: 74 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | Senate: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Immigration | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 27-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House (72-Y 27-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1430H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11105054D-H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-04 | House: Committee substitute printed 11105054D-H1 | |
2011-02-04 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 4-N) | |
2011-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) | |
2011-01-19 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #3 Immigration | |
2010-11-02 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-11-02 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100625D |