VA HB1460 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; subtraction for low-income military veterans with a permanent service-connected disability. Provides an income tax subtraction for the military retirement income received by a veteran who has been rated with a 100 percent service-connected, permanent, and total disability for taxable years on and after January 1, 2023. The bill provides that the subtraction is available only to those taxpayers whose federal adjusted gross income is not greater than 150 percent of the federal poverty level for a four-person household.
Title
Income tax, state; subtraction for low-income mil. veteran w/permanent service-connected disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Finance |
2023-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-13 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-12-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-12-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100885D |