VA HB1509 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0956)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0956)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Food Access Investment Program and Fund. Creates the Virginia Food Access Investment Program and Fund to provide funding for the construction, rehabilitation, equipment upgrades, or expansion of grocery stores, small food retailers, and innovative food retail projects, defined in the bill, in underserved communities.
Title
Virginia Food Access Investment Program and Fund; established and created, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (80-Y 17-N 1-A) (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsidered receding from substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate receded from substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 95-N) (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (84-Y 13-N 1-A) (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (80-Y 17-N 1-A) (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsidered receding from substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate receded from substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 95-N) (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (84-Y 13-N 1-A) (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0956) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 956 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1509ER) |
2020-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-07 | House | VOTE: Adoption (80-Y 17-N 1-A) |
2020-03-07 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (80-Y 17-N 1-A) |
2020-03-07 | House | Conference substitute printed 20109942D-H1 |
2020-03-07 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senators: McClellan, Favola, Pillion |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Delegates: McQuinn, Aird, Fowler |
2020-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-05 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reconsidered receding from substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate receded from substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 95-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 20109410D-S1 (0-Y 95-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1509S1 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20109410D-S1 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20109410D-S1 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (84-Y 13-N 1-A) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (84-Y 13-N 1-A) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (19-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-08 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105227D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1073 (Same As) 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0957)