VA HB155 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0175)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0175)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund; claims. Provides that in claims for an award under the Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund involving claims of sexual abuse of a minor where the conduct constitutes a felony, the passage of time shall not be a barrier to when the victim can file a claim. Under current law, such claim involving sexual abuse of a minor shall be filed within 10 years after the minor's eighteenth birthday.
Title
Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund; claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0175) | |
2024-03-28 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 175 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB155ER) |
2024-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-01 | House | VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-01 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 24108301D-S1 (94-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB155S1 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24108301D-S1 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24108301D-S1 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-01-25 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB155H1 |
2024-01-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24105661D-H1 |
2024-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2024-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-19 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 24105661D-H1 |
2024-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2024-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100789D |
Same As/Similar To
SB646 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0254)