VA HB1555 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0527)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0527)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Agency directors; human resources training and succession planning. Directs the Department of Human Resource Management (the Department) to administer training programs to familiarize agency directors with state human resource policies, such as compensation management, benefits administration, and resources available at the Department. The bill requires (i) the Department to offer training programs at least twice per year, (ii) each agency director to attend a training program with the agency chief human resource officer within six months after the director's appointment and thereafter at least once every four years, (iii) the agency chief human resource officer to provide subsequent training on agency-specific human resource policies, and (iv) each agency director to develop and submit annually to the Department an agency succession plan for key personnel, executive positions, and employees nearing retirement. The bill also requires public institutions of higher education to prepare a succession plan for presentation to the board of visitors with a copy to the Department.
Title
Agency directors; human resource training and agency succession planning.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate receded from amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0527) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 527 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1555ER) |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate receded from amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 100-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1555H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104801D-H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104801D-H1 |
2017-01-31 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-11 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2016-12-29 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-12-29 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103358D |