VA HB1564 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Planning and Budget; establishment of the Division of Regulatory Management and the Red Tape Reduction Commission; review of regulatory requirements; report. Creates the Division of Regulatory Management (the Division) within the Department of Planning and Budget to develop and maintain a state regulatory baseline of all current state regulatory requirements. The bill defines a regulatory requirement as any action required to be taken or information required to be provided in accordance with a statute, regulation, or policy in order to access government services or operate and conduct business. The bill also provides that after the regulatory baseline has been established, any subsequent regulatory requirement proposed by an agency that is not included in the initial state regulatory baseline is considered a new regulatory requirement and requires the approval of the Division before it may be enacted. The bill also creates the Red Tape Reduction Commission to review current state regulatory requirements and provide recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly on measures to reduce the baseline regulatory requirements.
Title
Planning & Budget, Department of; establishment of Div. of Regulatory Management & Red Tape Comm.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-31 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2017-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-02-01 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104902D-H1 |
2017-01-31 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 7-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-11 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2017-01-01 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101759D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Planning and Budget
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Planning and Budget
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 1500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1514.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1514.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2537 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2541 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4007.04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4007.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4011 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |