VA HB1574 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0340)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0340)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Marine Resources Commission; oysters; culling. Provides that when a person charged with violating an oyster culling regulation is required to scatter the entire cargo of oysters on the public rocks, no portion of the cargo shall be scattered anywhere else. The bill also requires the Marine Resources Commission to accept cash, check, or credit card payment of a bond paid in lieu of throwing the cargo overboard. Current law allows only payments in cash.
Title
Oyster culling regulation; cargo of oysters shall be scattered on public rocks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0340) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 340 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1574ER) |
2017-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1574H1 |
2017-02-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105104D-H1 |
2017-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105104D-H1 |
2017-02-01 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-12 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2017-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100623D |