VA HB1589 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0734)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0734)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Demolition of a derelict nonresidential structure with consent. Authorizes a locality to demolish or remove a derelict nonresidential structure and to file a lien against the property for the cost of the demolition or removal. The bill requires the locality to obtain the written consent of the property owner, and the property owner shall make a reasonable effort to obtain consent from the holder of any first lien mortgage or first lien deed of trust for such demolition or removal. The bill prohibits the use of the authority to remove a building that is located in a local historic district or individually designated as a historic landmark.
Title
Derelict nonresidential building or structure; demolition by locality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 3-N) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 3-N) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 101 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 2-N) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 3-N) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 3-N) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 101 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 2-N) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0734) | |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 734 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1589ER2) |
2013-04-03 | House | Reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 1-N) |
2013-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-21 | House | Governor's substitute printed 13105653D-H3 |
2013-03-21 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2013-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1589ER) |
2013-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 3-N) |
2013-02-23 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 3-N) |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2013-02-23 | House | Conference substitute printed 13105506D-H2 |
2013-02-21 | House | Delegates: Minchew, Marshall, D.W., Krupicka |
2013-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senators: Black, Favola, Smith |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2013-02-21 | House | House acceded to request |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 13105185D-S1 (0-Y 99-N) |
2013-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1589S1 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13105185D-S1 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13105185D-S1 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1589H1 |
2013-01-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104528D-H1 |
2013-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104528D-H1 |
2013-01-25 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 2-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: #2 |
2013-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2013-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102354D |
Same As/Similar To
SB744 (Same As) 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0770)