VA HB1592 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; early voting. Provides that any registered voter qualified to vote in the election may vote in person from 19 to three days before the election at specified times and at the sites provided in the locality. The provisions for absentee voting remain in effect except that the provisions for in-person absentee voting are superseded by the early voting process during the early voting period.
Title
Early voting; any registered voter qualified to vote in election may vote in person.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2013-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee |
2013-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2013-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102849D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB1592 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1592+hil |