VA HB1593 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Homestead exemption; bankruptcy exemptions. Makes various changes to homestead exemptions, including providing that the official schedule of property claimed exempt filed with the United States Bankruptcy Court in a bankruptcy proceeding constitutes a sufficient writing to exempt such real and personal property from creditor process. The bill also provides that a householder may hold exempt from creditor process real or personal property that the householder or his dependent uses as a principal residence not exceeding $25,000 in value.
Title
Homestead exemption; bankruptcy exemptions.
Sponsors
Del. Paul Krizek [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-01-26 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104765D |