VA HB16 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0081)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0081)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Safe haven protections; newborn safety device. Provides an affirmative defense in certain criminal prosecutions and civil proceedings regarding child abuse or neglect to a parent who safely delivers his child within the first 30 days of the child's life to a newborn safety device located at a hospital that provides 24-hour emergency services or at an attended emergency medical services agency that employs emergency medical services personnel. The bill also provides civil and criminal immunity to such hospitals and emergency medical services agencies for injuries to children received through such newborn safety devices, provided that (i) the injuries are not the result of gross negligence or willful misconduct and (ii) the hospital or emergency medical services agency meets certain requirements regarding the establishment, functioning, and testing of the device. Current law requires the child to be delivered within the first 14 days of the child's life at such hospital or emergency medical services agency.
Title
Safe haven protections; newborn safety device at hospitals for reception of children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (91-Y 9-N) (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0081) | |
2022-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 81 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB16ER) |
2022-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-23 | House | VOTE: Adoption (91-Y 9-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 22106679D-S1 (91-Y 9-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB16S1 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106679D-S1 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106679D-S1 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-09 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2021-12-23 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-12-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101060D |
Same As/Similar To
SB63 (Same As) 2022-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0080)
SB63 (Same As) 2022-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0080)
SB63 (Same As) 2022-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0080)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 228 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 371 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 371.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |