VA HB1600 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-3)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0491)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-3)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0491)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Student discipline; long-term suspension. Reduces the maximum length of a long-term suspension from 364 calendar days to 45 school days. The bill permits a long-term suspension to extend beyond a 45-school-day period, not to exceed 364 calendar days, if (i) the offense involves weapons, drugs, or serious bodily injury or (ii) the school board or division superintendent or his designee finds that aggravating circumstances exist, as defined by the Department of Education. The bill requires the Department of Education's definition of aggravating circumstances to include consideration of a student's disciplinary history.
Title
Student discipline; long-term suspension.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 13-N) (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (84-Y 15-N) (Y: 84 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 15-N) (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (84-Y 15-N) (Y: 84 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 15-N) (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0491) | |
2018-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 491 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1600ER) |
2018-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-28 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 13-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107271D-S1 (85-Y 13-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (34-Y 6-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1600S1 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18107271D-S1 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18107271D-S1 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-06 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (84-Y 15-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Passed House (84-Y 15-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2018-02-06 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 15-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (83-Y 15-N) |
2018-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1600H1 |
2018-02-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18106154D-H1 |
2018-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106154D-H1 |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-26 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18105597D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 276.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 277.05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |