VA HB1624 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1624
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Conservation of trees during land development process. Authorizes any locality to adopt an ordinance providing for either the conservation of or the planting and replacement of trees during the land development process. Currently, only a locality within Planning District 8 with a population density of 75 persons per square mile and which is classified as an eight-hour nonattainment area for ozone under the federal Clean Air Act and Amendments of 1990, in effect as of July 1, 2008, may adopt such an ordinance for the conservation of trees.
Title
Trees; conservation during land development process.
Sponsors
Del. Joshua Cole [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-31 | House | Continued to 2021 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Land Use |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105630D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1624 (Carry Over) 2020-01-31 - Continued to 2021 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1624 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1624+hil |