VA HB1626 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Board of visitors of Radford University; reduced rate tuition charges; students who reside in and are domiciled in the Appalachian region. Permits the board of visitors of Radford University to charge reduced rate tuition to any student enrolled at Radford University who resides in the Appalachian region, as defined in relevant federal law, is domiciled in the Appalachian region, and is entitled to in-state tuition charges at a public institution of higher education in the Appalachian region and such entitlement is based on circumstances that when applied to a student who resides in the Commonwealth would result in entitlement to in-state tuition, provided that reduced rate tuition for students who reside in and are domiciled in the Appalachian region shall not be set below the in-state tuition rate for Virginia students attending Radford University.
Title
Radford University; reduced rate tuition charges, students who reside in Appalachian region.
Sponsors
Del. Jason Ballard [R] | Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Education |
2023-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-12 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2023-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101591D |
Subjects
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Radford University
Students
Tuition
Radford University
Students
Tuition