VA HB1627 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Common Interest Community Board; annual payment by common interest communities. Changes the minimum amount payable annually by common interest communities to the Common Interest Community Board from the lesser of $1,000 or five hundredths of one percent (0.05%) to the lesser of $3,000 or three hundredths of one percent (0.03%).
Title
Common Interest Community Board; annual payment by common interest communities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2011-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-02-01 | House: Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing | |
2011-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101050D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1627 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1627+hil |