VA HB1628 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee voting; eligibility of persons age 65 or older. Entitles a person who will be age 65 or older on the day of an election to vote by absentee ballot in that election.
Title
Absentee voting; persons age 65 or older.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-12 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-10-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-10-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100383D |