VA HB1644 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Senate: Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Senate: Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; physical education requirement. Requires at least 150 minutes of physical education per week on average during the regular school year for grades K through eight, with a similar goal for high school students. This requirement would go into effect beginning with the 2014 -2015 school year, and would not apply to any half-day kindergarten program. This bill incorporates
Title
Public schools; physical education requirement, exception.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Dance [D] | Del. Algie Howell [D] | Del. Matthew James [D] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] |
Del. John O'Bannon [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 31-N) (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 31-N) (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | Senate: Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Public Education | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-01 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 31-N) | |
2011-02-01 | House: Read third time and passed House (65-Y 31-N) | |
2011-01-31 | House: Printed as engrossed 11104651D-EH1 | |
2011-01-31 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB1644EH1 | |
2011-01-31 | House: Amendments by Delegate O'Bannon agreed to | |
2011-01-31 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104651D-H1 | |
2011-01-31 | House: Read second time | |
2011-01-28 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-27 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-26 | House: Incorporates HB1710 | |
2011-01-26 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104651D-H1 | |
2011-01-26 | House: Reported from Education with substitute (16-Y 6-N) | |
2011-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned Education sub: #1 Standards of Quality | |
2011-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100332D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1710 (Similar To) 2011-01-26 - House: Incorporated by Education (HB1644-O'Bannon) by voice vote