VA HB1649 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0197)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0197)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Passing stationary refuse collection vehicles. Requires that, with due regard to safety and traffic conditions, drivers of motor vehicles overtaking stationary vehicles in the process of refuse collection (i) on a highway of at least four lanes, yield the right of way by a making a lane change into a nonadjacent lane or (ii) on a highway of fewer than four lanes or if changing lanes would be unreasonable or unsafe, decrease speed to 10 mph below the posted speed limit and pass at least two feet to the left of the stationary vehicle.
Title
Stationary refuse-collection vehicles; procedure for passing and overtaking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 2-N) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 2-N) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0197) | |
2015-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 197 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1649ER) |
2015-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 2-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (92-Y 2-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-27 | House | Reported from Transportation (20-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102485D |