VA HB1650 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Sales and use tax revenue; distributed to certain localities. Provides that if a heavy rail commuter mass transportation infill station is constructed in a service district in a locality, then the locality is entitled to retain the sales and use tax revenue generated in the service district, not to exceed $1.25 million per year, to pay bonds issued to construct such station.
Title
Retail Sales and Use Tax; revenue distributed to certain localities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (5-Y 5-N) (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Finance |
2013-01-28 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (5-Y 5-N) |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned Finance sub: #2 |
2013-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100872D |