VA HB1652 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (6-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (6-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Personal property tax; valuation of certain motor vehicles. Provides that the cost basis used in the valuation of motor vehicles that are not listed in an official pricing guide be reduced by the amount of any rebates.
Title
Personal property tax; valuation of certain motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (6-Y 9-N) (Y: 6 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (6-Y 9-N) | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-27 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-27 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-26 | House: Printed as engrossed 11102655D-E | |
2011-01-26 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1652E | |
2011-01-26 | House: Amendment by Delegate Cosgrove agreed to | |
2011-01-26 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2011-01-26 | House: Read second time | |
2011-01-25 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-24 | House: Reported from Finance with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-19 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #2 | |
2011-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102655D |