VA HB1662 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0196)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0196)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Child restraint devices and safety belts; emergency and law-enforcement vehicles. Exempts the operators of emergency medical services agency vehicles, fire company vehicles, fire department vehicles, and law-enforcement agency vehicles during the performance of their official duties from (i) the requirement that certain minors be secured with a safety belt and (ii) the requirement that minors under the age of eight be secured in a child restraint device, provided that exigent circumstances exist and no child restraint device is readily available. This bill is identical to SB 1677.
Title
Child restraint devices and safety belts; exempts emergency and law-enforcement vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0196) | |
2019-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 196 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-19 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1662ER) |
2019-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 19106387D-S1 (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1662S1 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106387D-S1 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106387D-S1 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1662H1 |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19104859D-H1 |
2019-01-22 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee substitute printed 19104859D-H1 |
2019-01-17 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-09 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-12-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100134D |