VA HB1668 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0601)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Public Procurement Act; high-risk contracts; report. Requires the Department of General Services (DGS), the Virginia Information Technologies Agency (VITA), and the Office of the Attorney General, as appropriate, to review contract solicitations and contracts for any public contract with a state public body for goods, services, insurance, or construction that meets the definition of high-risk contract provided in the bill. The bill directs DGS and VITA to develop guidelines for state agencies to use when assigning staff to administer high-risk contracts and requires that such guidelines (i) provide that any staff designated as a contract administrator must have prior contract administration experience and (ii) direct an agency's chief procurement officer to communicate to such contract administrator, when he first assumes his role, his responsibilities for effectively administering the contract. Some provisions of the bill have a delayed effective date for implementation for certain high-risk contract review processes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Public Procurement Act; high-risk contracts, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0601)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 601 (effective - see bill)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1668ER)
2019-02-23HouseEnrolled
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-20SenatePassed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-20SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-20SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateReported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-13SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19106105D-EH1
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1668EH1
2019-02-04HouseAmendment by Delegate Carr agreed to
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute from Appropriations agreed to 19106105D-H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee amendments from General Laws rejected
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-01HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106105D-H1
2019-01-30HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-17HouseReported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-10HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-10HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2018-12-03HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2018-12-03HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100629D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
224303.01(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1668
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1668+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1668H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1668EH1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1668ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0601+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1104V0001+HB1668
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0047+HB1668
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0204V0004+HB1668
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0045+HB1668
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2498+HB1668
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0150+HB1668
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0373+HB1668
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0834HB1668+HB1668
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0893HB1668+HB1668
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3200+HB1668

Bill Comments

feedback