VA HB1671 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0276)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Child abuse and neglect; investigations by local boards of social services. Requires local boards of social services, when investigating an individual who is the subject of child abuse or neglect allegations or the subject of a family assessment, to determine whether such individual has resided in another state within at least the preceding five years and, if he has resided in another state, to request a search of the child abuse and neglect registry or equivalent

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child abuse and neglect; investigation of an individual by local boards of social services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0276)
2019-03-08 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 276 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1671ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-19SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19SenateRead third time
2019-02-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateAssigned Rehab sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1671H1
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19104689D-H1
2019-02-01HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 19104689D-H1
2019-01-29HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N)
2019-01-11HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-12-03HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2018-12-03HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100319D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6321505(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1671
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1671+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1671H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1671ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0276+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1202V0010+HB1671
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0061+HB1671
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2138+HB1671
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2212+HB1671
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0097+HB1671
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0772HB1671+HB1671
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0822HB1671+HB1671

Bill Comments

feedback