VA HB1675 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0454)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Servicemembers Civil Relief Act; attorney fees. Provides that, where the appointment of counsel is necessary pursuant to the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act, any attorney fees assessed shall not exceed $125, unless the court deems a higher amount appropriate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Servicemembers Civil Relief Act; attorney fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0454)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 454 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1675ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19101973D-E
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1675E
2019-02-04HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-01HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-07HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-12-04HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-12-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101973D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
80115.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1675
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1675+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1675E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1675ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0454+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0803V0027+HB1675
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0090+HB1675
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2302+HB1675
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0273+HB1675
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0538HB1675+HB1675
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0633HB1675+HB1675

Bill Comments

feedback