VA HB1682 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0201)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0201)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Alexandria. Deletes numerous outdated provisions and updates references to the Code of Virginia.
Title
Alexandria, City of; amending charter, changes certain powers of mayor, city council, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0201) | |
2015-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 201 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1682ER) |
2015-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (10-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | House | Printed as engrossed 15100559D-E |
2015-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1682E |
2015-02-03 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (19-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-21 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2015-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2015-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100559D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1214 (Same As) 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0294)