VA HB1687 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax; increases in assessed value for prior years. Reduces the period of time in which the assessed value of real property may be increased for prior years from the three preceding tax years to the preceding tax year.
Title
Real property tax; increases in assessed value for prior years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 24-N) (Y: 77 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 24-N) (Y: 77 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-12 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-24 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 24-N) |
2013-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House (75-Y 24-N) |
2013-01-23 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-21 | House | Reported from Finance (15-Y 5-N) |
2013-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned Finance sub: #2 |
2013-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102001D |