VA HB1713 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0450)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0450)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; presumption against admission to bail. Adds to the list of crimes charged for which there is a presumption against admission to bail, subject to rebuttal, obstruction of justice where a person threatens bodily harm or force to knowingly attempt to intimidate or impede a witness.
Title
Presumption against admission to bail; adds to list of crimes committed.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0450) | |
2011-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 450 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-24 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1713ER) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-18 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 11105312D-S1 (93-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1713S1 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11105312D-S1 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11105312D-S1 | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-25 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-21 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-19 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-14 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102837D |