VA HB1720 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0573)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Possession or distribution of cannabidiol oil or THC-A oil; public schools. Provides that no school nurse employed by a local school board, person employed by a local health department who is assigned to the public school pursuant to an agreement between the local health department and the school board, or other person employed by or contracted with a local school board to deliver health-related services shall be prosecuted for possession or distribution of cannabidiol oil or THC-A oil for storing, dispensing, or administering cannabidiol oil or THC-A oil, in accordance with a policy adopted by the local school board, to a student who has been issued a valid written certification for the use of cannabidiol oil or THC-A oil. The bill also provides that the Department of Health Professions, in coordination with the Department of Education, shall develop and make available to school boards a standardized form that is to be completed by the practitioner who issues a written certification and a pharmaceutical processor that dispenses the cannabidiol oil or THC-A oil to a student. The bill also provides that no school board shall be required to suspend or expel any student who holds a valid written certification for the use of cannabidiol oil or THC-A oil issued by a practitioner for the possession or use of such oil in accordance with the student's individualized health plan and in compliance with a policy adopted by the school board. This bill is identical to SB 1632.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabidiol oil and THC-A oil; possession or distribution at public school.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0573)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 573 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1720ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference substitute printed 19107602D-H2
2019-02-23 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Sturtevant, Peake, Edwards
2019-02-21SenateConferees reappointed by Senate
2019-02-20SenateSenators: Obenshain, Peake, Edwards
2019-02-20SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-19HouseDelegates: Hurst, Bell, Robert B., Collins
2019-02-19HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-19HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-18SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-18SenateSenate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N)
2019-02-14HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 19106546D-S1 (0-Y 96-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed by for the day
2019-02-13HouseReconsideration of Senate substitute agreed to by House
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19106546D-S1 (96-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1720S1
2019-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106546D-S1
2019-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106546D-S1
2019-02-06SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-31HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1720H1
2019-01-30HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105452D-H1
2019-01-30HouseRead second time
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105452D-H1
2019-01-25HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-12-17HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-12-17HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100264D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221277(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1720
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1720+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1720H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1720S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1720H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1720ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0573+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0054+HB1720
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0070+HB1720
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2055+HB1720
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0217+HB1720
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0488HB1720+HB1720
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0492HB1720+HB1720
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2783+HB1720
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2824+HB1720
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0731HB1720+HB1720
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1083HB1720+HB1720
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3324+HB1720

Bill Comments

feedback