VA HB173 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; prohibited practices by mixed beverage licensees; exception. Allows a mixed beverage licensee to transfer spirits from the original larger bottle or container that was purchased by the licensee to a smaller one, provided that (i) the smaller bottle is the same brand and type as the spirits contained in the larger bottle or container that was purchased by the licensee and (ii) the larger bottle or container is kept in the same serving area. Currently, a mixed beverage licensee must keep alcoholic beverages in the bottle or container in which they were purchased. The bill contains a technical amendment.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; prohibited practices by mixed beverage licensees, exception.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2016-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-01-26 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2015-12-23 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-12-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101293D |