VA HB1739 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0394)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0394)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Landlord and tenant laws; applicability to campgrounds. Provides that campgrounds are not subject to the landlord and tenant law or the Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Landlord and tenant laws; applicability to campgrounds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0394) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 394 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1739ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-29 | House | Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2015-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103400D |