VA HB1753 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Law Enforcement Professional Standards Commission Accreditation Grant Fund and Program. Establishes the Virginia Law Enforcement Professional Standards Commission Accreditation Grant Fund (the Fund) and the Virginia Law Enforcement Professional Standards Commission Accreditation Grant Program (the Program). The Fund and Program shall be overseen by the Department of Criminal Justice Services. Disbursements from the Fund shall be made to law-enforcement agencies to pursue accreditation from the Virginia Law Enforcement Professional Standards Commission.
Title
Va. Law Enforcement Professional Standards Commission Accreditation Grant Fund & Program; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2021-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-15 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2021-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-15 | House | Reported from Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-12-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2020-12-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100771D |