VA HB177 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0385)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0385)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cutting of grass; statewide application. Makes current grass-cutting provisions applicable statewide for all localities.
Title
Cutting of grass; statewide application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 19-N) (Y: 81 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 19-N) (Y: 81 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0385) | |
2014-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 385 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB177ER) |
2014-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (10-Y 4-N 1-A) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-29 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 19-N) |
2014-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House (80-Y 19-N) |
2014-01-28 | House | Printed as engrossed 14100739D-E |
2014-01-28 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB177E |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-01-28 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-24 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (18-Y 3-N) |
2014-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-09 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: #1 |
2013-12-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2013-12-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100739D |