VA HB1774 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1774
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Tangible personal property taxes; classification of certain motor vehicles, trailers, and semitrailers. Provides that the separate class of property for rate purposes that includes motor vehicles, trailers, and semitrailers with a gross vehicle weight of 10,000 pounds or more used by a motor carrier engaged in interstate commerce on a for-hire basis shall also include such vehicles used to transport passengers. Under current law, this class of property only includes such vehicles if they are used to transport property.
Title
Tangible personal property taxes;classification of certain motor vehicles, trailers, & semitrailers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-21 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2021-01-21 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-18 | House | Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-12-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-12-28 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100876D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1774 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)