VA HB1778 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Clean-Fuel Vehicle and Advanced Cellulosic Biofuels Job Creation Tax Credit; sunset. Extends the Clean-Fuel Vehicle and Advanced Cellulosic Biofuels Job Creation Tax Credit for five years, through taxable year 2019.
Title
Clean-Fuel Vehicle & Advanced Cellulosic Biofuels Job Creation Tax Credit; extends sunset provision.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Finance |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102135D |