VA HB1778 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Purchase and transport of firearms; simple assault hate crime. Prohibits persons convicted of simple assault or assault and battery when the victim was selected because of his race, religious conviction, color, or national origin from purchasing or transporting a firearm for five years following such conviction.
Title
Purchase and transport of firearms; simple assault hate crime.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #2 |
2017-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102510D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.1:6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 57 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |