VA HB1778 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1778
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Removal of clutter from property; civil penalty. Provides that a locality may by ordinance require the removal of clutter from property, or may, whenever the governing body deems it necessary, after reasonable notice, have such clutter removed by its own agents or employees, in which event the cost or expenses thereof shall be chargeable to and paid by the owners of such property and may be collected by the locality as taxes are collected. The bill defines "clutter" as including mechanical equipment, household furniture, containers, and similar items that may be detrimental to the well-being of a community when they are left in public view for an extended period or are allowed to accumulate. Violations of the bill are subject to the existing civil penalty applicable to violations of provisions relating to the removal of trash, garbage, refuse, litter, and similar substances from property.
Title
Removal of clutter from property; definition, civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 43-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-29 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (12-Y 9-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Land Use |
2020-12-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-12-29 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101674D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1778 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)