VA HB1828 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0603)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Funeral services; sale of caskets. Prohibits any person except a licensed funeral service establishment or funeral service licensee from offering for sale or selling a casket when preneed arrangements for funeral services are being made, including preneed funeral contracts and preneed funeral planning. The bill provides that the requirement that a funeral service licensee accept a casket provided by a third party applies only in cases in which funeral arrangements are made at-need. This bill is identical to SB 1247.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sale of caskets; preneed arrangements for funeral services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0603)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 603 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1828ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1828H1
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105047D-H1
2019-02-01HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105047D-H1
2019-01-29HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
2019-01-11HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-02HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-02HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101662D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412800(n/a)See Bill Text
5412808.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1828
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1828+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1828H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1828ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0603+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1202V0019+HB1828
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0062+HB1828
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2140+HB1828
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2214+HB1828
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0104+HB1828
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB1828+HB1828
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0633HB1828+HB1828

Bill Comments

feedback