VA HB1836 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0693)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0693)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fire insurance policies; change in amount of coverage. Prohibits an insurer from increasing or decreasing the amount of fire insurance coverage, including fire insurance in combination with other coverage, on commercial property under a policy that has been in effect for at least 60 days unless the first named insured has consented in writing to such a change.
Title
Fire insurance policies; change in amount of coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0693) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 693 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1836ER) |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-18 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-17 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Printed as engrossed 19101169D-E |
2019-01-16 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1836E |
2019-01-16 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-01-16 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-15 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-14 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-10 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101169D |