VA HB1839 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0653)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Industrial hemp; federal Farm Bill; emergency. Conforms Virginia law to the provisions of the federal 2018 Farm Bill by amending the definitions of cannabidiol oil, marijuana, and tetrahydrocannabinol (THC) to exclude industrial hemp in the possession of a registered person, hemp products, or an oil containing no more than 0.3% THC. The bill defines "industrial hemp" as any part of the plant Cannabis sativa that has a concentration of THC that is no greater than that allowed by federal law, and it defines "hemp product" as any finished product that is otherwise lawful and that contains industrial hemp. The bill adds the category of "dealer" in industrial hemp to the existing registration categories of grower and processor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Industrial hemp; federal Farm Bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0653)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 653 (effective 3/21/19)
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1839ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14HouseVOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-12SenatePassed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-12SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-12SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-12SenateRead third time
2019-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1839H1
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106006D-H1
2019-02-01HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106006D-H1
2019-01-30HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-09HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-02HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-01-02HousePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/09/19 19101287D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182247(n/a)See Bill Text
324112(n/a)See Bill Text
324113(n/a)See Bill Text
324114(n/a)See Bill Text
324114.1(n/a)See Bill Text
324114.2(n/a)See Bill Text
324115(n/a)See Bill Text
324116(n/a)See Bill Text
324117(n/a)See Bill Text
324118(n/a)See Bill Text
324119(n/a)See Bill Text
5413401(n/a)See Bill Text
5413408.3(n/a)See Bill Text
5413446(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1839
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1839+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1839H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1839ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0653+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0101V0019+HB1839
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H01V0022+HB1839
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2141+HB1839
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2215+HB1839
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S01V0065+HB1839
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0501HB1839+HB1839
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0520HB1839+HB1839
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2827+HB1839

Bill Comments

feedback