VA HB1845 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0758)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0758)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Criminal Justice Services; model addiction recovery program; jails. Requires the Department of Criminal Justice Services, in consultation with the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, to develop a model addiction recovery program that may be administered by sheriffs, deputy sheriffs, jail officers, administrators, or superintendents in any local or regional jail. The bill provides that such programs shall be based on existing addiction recovery programs being administered by any local or regional jails in the Commonwealth and requires that participation in such program be voluntary and that such program address multiple aspects of the recovery process, including medical and clinical recovery, peer-to-peer support, availability of mental health resources, family dynamics, and aftercare aspects of the recovery process.
Title
Model addiction recovery program; DCJS, et al., to develop.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate receded from amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0758) | |
2017-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 758 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1845ER) |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate receded from amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 99-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (12-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1845H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104998D-H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104998D-H1 |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2017-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100872D |
Subjects
Commonwealth Public Safety
Criminal Justice Services
Criminal Procedure
Jails and Prisons
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Criminal Justice Services
Criminal Procedure
Jails and Prisons
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction