VA HB1860 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0476)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0476)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Solicitation of contributions; collection receptacles. Provides that no (i) business as defined in § 58.1-3700.1, other than a charitable or civic organization to which contributions are deductible under § 170 of the Internal Revenue Code, or (ii) professional solicitor shall place or maintain a receptacle in public view for the purpose of collecting donated clothing, household items, or other items for future resale unless such person or professional solicitor places on the receptacle a permanent sign or label that includes certain disclosure information printed in letters that are no less than three inches in height and no less than one-half inch in width and in a color that contrasts with the color of the receptacle, which sign or label shall be placed immediately below the opening in the receptacle used to deposit donations. The bill provides that the penalty for violation is limited to the civil penalties contained in the solicitation of contributions law.
Title
Collection receptacles for clothing, household items, etc.; required disclosures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 10-N) (Y: 92 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 10-N) (Y: 92 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0476) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 476 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1860ER) |
2015-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 10-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (90-Y 10-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Printed as engrossed 15104661D-EH1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1860EH1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Amendment by Delegate Rasoul agreed to |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104661D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104661D-H1 |
2015-02-05 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102352D |