VA HB1881 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1881
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0402)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0402)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Enterprise zone job creation grants. Provides that, for purposes of wage requirements for the enterprise zone job creation grant program, the minimum wage shall be the higher of the state minimum wage or the federal minimum wage. The bill also reduces the percentage of the minimum wage that grant eligible jobs must meet. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022.
Title
Enterprise zone job creation grants; wage requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 8-N) (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 8-N) (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0402) | |
2021-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 402 (effective 1/1/22) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 20201 |
2021-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1881ER) |
2021-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-19 | House | VOTE: Passage (91-Y 8-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Read third time and passed House (91-Y 8-N) |
2021-01-18 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-14 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102085D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1881 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)