VA HB190 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0594)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0594)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax exemption for disabled veterans. Requires the Commissioner of the Department of Veterans Services to promulgate rules and regulations for the administration and implementation of the real property tax exemption for disabled veterans. Such rules and regulations shall include written guidance for veterans and commissioners of the revenue concerning eligibility for the exemption. The bill also authorizes the Commissioner of the Department of Veterans Services to hear and decide appeals concerning denials of eligibility for the exemption. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Real estate tax; exemption for disabled veterans.
Sponsors
Del. Richard Bell [R] | Del. Gordon Helsel [R] | Del. Donald Merricks [R] | Del. John O'Bannon [R] |
Del. David Ramadan [R] | Del. Thomas Rust [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0594) | |
2012-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 594 (effective 4/4/12) | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-09 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-09 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB190ER) | |
2012-03-09 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-06 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 12105741D-S1 (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB190S1 | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105741D-S1 | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105741D-S1 | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-09 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB190H1 | |
2012-02-08 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105029D-H1 | |
2012-02-08 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-06 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105029D-H1 | |
2012-02-06 | House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-12 | House: Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 | |
2012-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/11/12 12103821D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 3219.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3219.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3219.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |