VA HB1904 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Voter registration; registration on election day; registration of provisional voters; close of registration records. Provides that persons who are otherwise qualified to register to vote are entitled to register to vote and cast a ballot in person in the office of the general registrar, or at another location or locations in the county or city approved by the electoral board, on the day of the election. Additionally, the provisional ballot of a person who is required to vote a provisional ballot because his name does not appear on the pollbook shall be counted if the general registrar determines during the canvass that the person was qualified for registration based upon the application for registration submitted by the person with his provisional ballot. The bill also requires registration records to be closed for the purpose of registering voters during the three days prior to any election. Currently, the registration records are required to be closed for this purpose during the 21 days prior to a primary or general election, six days prior to certain special elections, and 13 days prior to other special elections. The bill adjusts other deadlines to reflect this change.
Title
Voter registration; registration on election day, registration of provisional voters, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] |
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] |
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Debra Rodman [D] | Sen. Danica Roem [D] |
Del. Cheryl Turpin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-12 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100783D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 416 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 416.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 420.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 653 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |